Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships
Sponsored by
Delegates Saab, Angel, Barkley, Barron, Beidle, Beitzel, Bromwell, Brooks, Buckel, Carey, Chang, Clark, Cullison, Ebersole, Folden, Glass, Glenn, Hayes, Hornberger, S. Howard, Jacobs, Jameson, Kipke, Korman, Kramer, Krebs, Malone, McComas, McConkey, McCray, McDonough, McKay, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Platt, Reilly, Rey, Robinson, Rose, Sample-Hughes, Shoemaker, Simonaire, Sophocleus, Szeliga, Tarlau, Waldstreicher, West, Wivell, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Expanding the duties of a guardian of a disabled person to include the duty to foster and preserve family relationships including assisting to arrange specified visitation and communication.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {216286/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Notice and Visitation by Family
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable with Amendments {216286/1 Adopted 55
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Text - Third - Estates - Duties of Guardian of the Person - Fostering and Preserving Family Relationships
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Referred Rules 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/30/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM