Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
Sponsored by
Delegates Atterbeary, Acevero, Carr, Cullison, W. Fisher, Hill, Ivey, Kelly, R. Lewis, Moon, Mosby, Palakovich Carr, Pena-Melnyk, Shetty, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting, except under certain circumstances, a government agent from requesting information about immigration or citizenship status of a person or a person's family members or acquaintances; prohibiting a government agent from coercing information or action from a person by using certain information; prohibiting a government agent from detaining or questioning a person based on a certain immigration or citizenship status of the person or any other person; authorizing a person to use a certain legal remedy under certain circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0718
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {942217/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {423429/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-91)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (91-48)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2019
Legislative Date
3/16/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/16/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Favorable with Amendments {942217/1 Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Morgan) Adopted 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Floor Amendment {423429/1 (Delegate Saab) Rejected (39-91) 48
House 3/16/2019 3/13/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - State Government – Government Agents – Requests for and Use of Immigration Status Information
House 3/18/2019 3/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (91-48) 49
Senate 3/18/2019 3/16/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 48
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM