Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Second Chance Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Delegates Anderson, Waldstreicher, Branch, Cardin, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Glenn, Gutierrez, Harper, Haynes, Holmes, Ivey, Luedtke, McIntosh, Mizeur, Oaks, Reznik, B. Robinson, Rosenberg, Simmons, Stukes, Swain, Tarrant, F. Turner, Valderrama, A. Washington, and Wilson
Status
In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to petition the court to shield specified information relating to a conviction of the person no earlier than 3 years after the person satisfies the sentence imposed for the conviction, including parole, probation, or mandatory supervision; providing that if the person is not eligible for shielding of one conviction in a unit, the person is not eligible for shielding of any other conviction in the unit; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0804
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1006 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {382112/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {503622/1 Rejected (44-85)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-49)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {538079/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
69
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {382112/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Floor Amendment (Delegate Kipke) {503622/1 Rejected (44-85) 49
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/17/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (87-49) 50
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {538079/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (43-4) 60
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 House Requests Senate Recede 69
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301 through 10-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM