Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Rates
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Arentz, Beitzel, Folden, Grammer, Krebs, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Rose, Shoemaker, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing from 4.75% to 4% over a period of years the State income tax rates imposed on the Maryland taxable income of specified individuals with income between $3,001 and $100,000 and specified spouses filing a joint return, surviving spouses or heads of household with income between $3,001 and $150,000; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2019; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016, July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/11/2016 Text - First - Income Tax - Rates
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM