Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive Consideration
Sponsored by
Delegates Fennell and Davis
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Limiting the circumstances under which a credit services business is prohibited from charging or receiving any money or other valuable consideration prior to full and complete performance of the services that the credit services business has agreed to perform for or on behalf of the consumer; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0893
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Law - Credit Services Businesses - Authority to Charge and Receive Consideration
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-1902 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM