Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Discounts, Complimentary Licenses, and Reporting
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to implement certain programs to provide certain discounted licenses, stamps, and permits to Maryland residents who meet certain criteria; authorizing the Department to issue certain complimentary licenses and permits to an out-of-state person who certifies that the person meets certain criteria if the person's state of residence extends similar privileges to a person meeting the same criteria; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Discounts, Complimentary Licenses, and Reporting
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-301, 10-303, 4-604, 4-607, 4-745 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 2:23 PM