Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Cox
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a health care provider or health care institution to ensure the provision or continuation of certain care under certain circumstances; authorizing a certain health care provider or health care institution to transfer a patient to a certain health care provider or health care institution under certain circumstances and in a certain manner; prohibiting an agency from developing or using certain measures as a threshold for certain determinations and decisions; etc.
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2021
Legislative Date
3/01/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2021
Legislative Date
3/18/2021
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Maryland Nondiscrimination in Health Care Coverage Act
House 3/01/2021 3/01/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing canceled
House 3/18/2021 3/18/2021 Hearing 3/19 at 4:00 p.m.
Age
(   5-6A-01 through 5-6A-06 )
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page