Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Minority Teacher Recruitment - Study and Report
Sponsored by
Delegate Hixson
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education, the Maryland Higher Education Commission, and the University System of Maryland to study and make recommendations on strategies to increase and improve minority teacher recruitment, preparation, development, and retention in elementary and secondary education in the State; requiring the Department, Commission, and System jointly to submit a specified report to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2013; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0548
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/13/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {485360/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2013
Legislative Date
3/16/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-2)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/16/2013
Legislative Date
5/16/2013
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/12/2013 3/13/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Favorable with Amendments {485360/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/19/2013 3/16/2013 Third Reading Passed (137-2) 49
Senate 3/20/2013 3/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 49
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/16/2013 5/16/2013 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM