Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Sponsored by
Delegates Holmes and Angel
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions of law concerning the authority of a municipality to establish a land bank authority; making specified provisions of law concerning the establishment of a land bank authority applicable to a municipality or county; authorizing two or more local governments to enter into an intergovernmental cooperation agreement; authorizing a governing body of a county or other taxing authority to transfer specified interest in property to an authority under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0957
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {710314/1 Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {559536/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2017
Legislative Date
5/25/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/18/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {710314/1 Adopted 49
House 3/18/2017 3/15/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
Text - Third - Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
House 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 51
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48
Senate 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments {559536/1 Adopted 58
Senate 4/04/2017 3/29/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 59
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 House Concurs Senate Amendments 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
Post Passage 5/25/2017 5/25/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 618
Text - Chapter - Counties and Municipalities - Land Bank Authorities
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1401, 1-1403, 1-1405, 1-1406, 1-1408, 1-1409, 1-1410, 1-1412, 1-1413, 1-1414, 1-1415, 1-1419, 1-1426, 5-401 through 5-431 )
(   14-808, 14-824, 14-826, 14-831 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM