Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a landowner whose land is subject to an agricultural land preservation easement to use the land for surface mining activities in accordance with certain provisions of law under certain circumstances notwithstanding the terms of the easement; and providing for the application of the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1125
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Agricultural Land Preservation Easements - Surface Mining
House 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM