Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Natural Resources - Black Fly Management and Control - Washington County
Sponsored by
Delegate Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to establish a program to control the spread of black flies in the State; requiring that the program be implemented initially on specified property in Washington County; requiring the Department, in conjunction with the Department of Entomology in the University of Maryland, to conduct the program in a specified manner; authorizing the Department to accept, use, or expend any aid, gift, or grant made available from any private or public source to implement the program; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0801
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-2201 through 8-2205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM