Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums - Warranty Claims
Sponsored by
Delegate Frush
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that, notwithstanding any provision in the declaration, bylaws, or rules and regulations of the condominium, a council of unit owners has the right to be involved in a specified manner in specified litigation or administrative proceedings affecting the condominium and to enforce implied warranties made to the council of unit owners by the developer; making unenforceable specified provisions of specified governing documents; applying the Act prospectively; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0250
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-109, 11-134.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM