Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Correctional, Police, and Law Enforcement Officers - Forfeiture of Retirement Benefits for Criminal Conviction
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, and Summers
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the payment of retirement benefits payable from the State Retirement and Pension System to specified correctional officers, police officers, and law enforcement officers who are convicted of or enter a plea of nolo contendere for specified crimes; requiring a specified court to order the forfeiture of specified retirement benefits under specified circumstances; requiring a specified court to order the restoration of specified retirement benefits under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/21/2014 2/24/2014 Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page