Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County - Property Tax Credit - Disabled Veterans
Sponsored by
Washington County Delegation
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Washington County to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the county property tax imposed on specified residential property owned by specified disabled veterans of active military, naval, or air service; providing for the amount of the property tax credit; requiring specified disabled veterans or surviving spouses to provide specified documents when applying for the property tax credit under the Act; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2015; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0923
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM