Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
Sponsored by
Delegates Howard, Bagnall, Chisholm, Krebs, Malone, and Saab
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certified alcohol and drug abuse program facility to provide a patient with a copy of certain records on the patient's request; requiring the members of a patient's ASAM criteria assessment team to meet with the patient for a certain purpose; requiring a certain facility to send certain application records to a certain treatment provider within 72 hours after completing the assessment under certain circumstances; requiring a certain treatment provider to provide certain referrals to certain treatment providers; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2019
Legislative Date
4/06/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Alcohol and Drug Abuse Program Facilities - ASAM Criteria Assessments
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/06/2019 4/06/2019 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM