Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Individuals With Developmental Disabilities - Providers - Licenses
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Health and Mental Hygiene)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a person to be licensed by the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene before the person may provide services to an individual with a developmental disability or a recipient of individual support services; repealing the authority of the Developmental Disabilities Administration to license specified persons to provide specified services; authorizing the Department to impose sanctions, including a civil money penalty not to exceed $5,000, for failure by a licensee to substantially comply with specified laws, regulations, and rules; etc.
Committees
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): September 1, 2015
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/02/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {576687/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Hearing 4/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/08/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 2/25/2015 2/26/2015 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/02/2015 3/02/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {576687/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 63
Senate 4/09/2015 4/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules 60
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/11/2015 4/11/2015 Hearing 4/13 at 9:00 a.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 64
House 4/13/2015 4/08/2015 Returned Passed 69
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-903 through 7-907, 7-909, 7-910 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM