Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegates Valderrama, Barkley, Adams, Branch, Brooks, Davis, Impallaria, Jameson, Vaughn, Aumann, Buckel, Clippinger, Lisanti, Luedtke, McCray, S. Robinson, Waldstreicher, and West
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified insured to elect to obtain specified enhanced underinsured motorist coverage under a private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance policy; requiring specified insurers to offer an enhanced underinsured motorist coverage under specified circumstances; providing for the characteristics of the enhanced underinsured motorist coverage; applying the Act to each policy of private passenger motor vehicle insurance issued, sold, or delivered in the State on or after July 1, 2017; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0751
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0730 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393699/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-41)
Proceedings
71
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable with Amendments {393699/1 Report Adopted 70
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 70
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Third Reading Passed (98-41) 71
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-509, 19-509.1, 19-509.2, 19-510, 19-511, 19-511.1, 19-513 )
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM