Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegates Jacobs, Arentz, Fisher, Ghrist, Long, Mautz, Metzgar, and Otto
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing a requirement that the Department of Natural Resources hold a certain hearing within 60 days after a person who holds a certain license to catch oysters received a citation for a certain offense; requiring the Department to hold a certain hearing before the revocation of an authorization to catch oysters and within 90 days after the cited individual commits a certain offense; requiring the Department to report annually on certain oyster poaching-related penalties to certain committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0558
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {720318/1 Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2018
Legislative Date
3/13/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
48B
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {964131/1 Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Gilchrist)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Requests Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Gilchrist)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Recede (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Committee Amendment {964131/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Senate Recede
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Favorable with Amendments {720318/1 Adopted 47A
House 3/17/2018 3/13/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Text - Third - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
House 3/19/2018 3/15/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 49
Senate 3/19/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 48B
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable with Amendments {964131/1 Adopted 57
Senate 3/29/2018 3/26/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 57
Senate 3/30/2018 3/27/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 60
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Gilchrist) 60
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Requests Senate Recede 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 House Conference Committee Appointed (Delegates Stein, Jacobs and Gilchrist) 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Recede (Senator Conway) Adopted 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Committee Amendment {964131/1 Withdrawn 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Senate Recede 63
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (42-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/29/2018 Senate Recede 63
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 520
Text - Chapter - Oyster Poaching - Administrative Penalties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM