Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the State Board of Elections conduct a certain automated software audit in collaboration with the local boards of elections; requiring the State Board, in collaboration with the local boards, to conduct a certain risk-limiting audit after each statewide election; repealing a requirement that the State Board conduct a certain manual audit after each statewide general election; repealing the authority of the State Board to conduct a certain manual audit after each statewide primary election; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law - Postelection Tabulation Audits - Risk-Limiting Audits
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 2:14 PM