Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Small Business Energy Assistance Act
Sponsored by
Delegates Kramer, Arora, Carr, Conaway, Frick, George, Guzzone, Luedtke, Rudolph, Simmons, and Wood
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Public Service Commission to establish a Small Commercial Energy Efficiency On-Bill Financing Program; specifying the purpose of the Program; authorizing the Commission to require a utility company to participate in the Program; authorizing customers to obtain a loan for an energy efficiency upgrade under specified circumstances; requiring the Commission to establish standards for a qualifying energy efficiency upgrade and eligibility requirements for customers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {873792/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-40)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
61A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2013 2/08/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2013 4/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Favorable with Amendments {873792/1 Report Adopted 59
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
House 4/02/2013 3/27/2013 Special Order until 4/3 (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted 61
House 4/04/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (98-40) 62
Senate 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 First Reading Senate Rules 61A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM