Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Schools - Substitute Teachers - Qualifications, Training, and Study
Sponsored by
Delegate Kaiser
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring each county board of education to establish qualifications for substitute teachers employed by a county board; requiring a county board to require each substitute teacher to complete an orientation and training program; requiring county boards to train specified school administrators in specified issues related to substitute teachers; requiring a county superintendent to develop a specified in-service training program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0760 Session: 2010 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/18/2014
Action
Reassigned to Ways and Means
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/20/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/18/2014 2/18/2014 Reassigned to Ways and Means 30
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/20/2014 2/20/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-201.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM