Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Sentencing - Subsequent Offenders (Career Criminal Truth in Sentencing Act)
Sponsored by
Delegates Buckel, Arentz, Beitzel, Cassilly, Folden, Grammer, S. Howard, Krebs, McComas, McKay, McMillan, Metzgar, Miele, Rose, Shoemaker, and Vogt
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that specified subsequent criminal offenders be sentenced to imprisonment for the maximum term allowed by law; prohibiting the court from suspending all or part of a mandatory sentence for specified subsequent criminal offenders; providing that specified subsequent criminal offenders are not eligible for parole or diminution credits; and requiring that the State follow specified procedural rules when prosecuting specified subsequent criminal offenders.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-101, 14-104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM