Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Police Officers - Incentives for Purchase of Dwelling in Baltimore City
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Baltimore City Police Officer Down Payment Assistance Program and the Baltimore City Police Officer Deferred Payment Loan Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; allowing certain eligible officers who purchase certain dwellings to claim a credit against the State income tax; authorizing the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a certain property tax credit against the tax imposed on a dwelling owned by certain eligible officers; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019, July 1, 2019, October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Baltimore City Police Officers - Incentives for Purchase of Dwelling in Baltimore City
House 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-3A-01 through 4-3A-06, 4-8A-01 through 4-8A-04 )
(   10-749 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM