Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
Sponsored by
Delegates Jackson, Barron, Knotts, McKay, Proctor, and Tarlau
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the first $50,000 in proceeds from the sale of a perpetual conservation easement on real property in the State.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0254
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {725366/1 Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (141-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/02/2017
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable with Amendments {725366/1 Adopted 66
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 66
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Perpetual Conservation Easements
House 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (141-0) 67
Senate 4/10/2017 4/02/2017 Referred Rules 62
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM