Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
Sponsored by
Delegates Hill, Bartlett, Brooks, Crutchfield, Cullison, D.E. Davis, Ebersole, Feldmark, Haynes, Jalisi, Johnson, Lafferty, R. Lewis, Lierman, McIntosh, Moon, Patterson, Proctor, Sample-Hughes, Smith, Stewart, Sydnor, Terrasa, Valderrama, Wells, and K. Young
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a certain dispensary or dispensary agent to ensure that medical cannabis grown using a pesticide and products containing medical cannabis grown using a pesticide have a label affixed at the time of sale stating that the medical cannabis was grown using pesticides; requiring the Department of Agriculture to study the health impacts of smoking medical cannabis that was grown using pesticides or being in close proximity to smoke from the burning of medical cannabis that was grown using pesticides; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Medical Cannabis - Pesticide Use - Labeling and Study
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Withdrawn by Sponsor
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM
Click to return on the top page