Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Standardbred Owners and Trainers - Benefit Programs
Sponsored by
Delegates Knotts and Luedtke
Status
Veto sustained (0-141)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the organization that represents a majority of the standardbred owners and trainers in the State to apply to the Secretary of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation for the reimbursement of specified expenditures not to exceed 2% of all open purses; providing that the reimbursement amount be deducted from the Purse Dedication Account funded by video lottery terminal revenues; specifying programs for which reimbursement is allowable; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1426 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-141)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {465666/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {259535/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/05/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-1)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/09/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/01/0001 1/13/2016 Veto sustained (0-141)
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2015 3/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments {465666/1 Report Adopted 46
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
House 3/20/2015 3/19/2015 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 49
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47A
Senate 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 4/13/2015 4/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Favorable with Amendments {259535/1 Report Adopted 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/05/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 63
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 64
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 House Concur - Senate Amendments 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-1) 70
House 4/13/2015 4/09/2015 Passed Enrolled 70
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-28.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM