Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Rental Deposit Assistance Loan Programs and Fund
Sponsored by
Delegates Krimm, Hettleman, Hill, Lierman, McKay, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a county or municipality to enact an ordinance or a resolution to establish a rental deposit assistance loan program; providing for the purpose and required elements of a program; establishing the Rental Deposit Assistance Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Secretary of Housing and Community Development to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
(   1-1401 through 1-1404 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page