Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Start-Up Businesses
Sponsored by
Delegates Rosenberg, Ali, and Buckel
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the calculation of a specified credit against the State income tax for Maryland qualified research and development expenses incurred by an individual or a corporation so as to allow the individual or corporation, subject to specified limitations, a credit in an amount equal to 5% of the Maryland qualified research and development expenses paid to a specified start-up business or paid or incurred by the individual or corporation during the taxable year, if the individual or corporation is a specified start-up business; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1134
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Start-Up Businesses
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Research and Development Credit - Start-Up Businesses
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing canceled
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-721 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM