Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - HOV Lanes - Plug-In Electric Drive and Hybrid Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegates McMillan, Anderton, Beidle, Carr, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Ghrist, Gilchrist, Holmes, Jacobs, Kipke, McCray, Miele, Moon, Oaks, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Stein, and Szeliga
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing specified hybrid vehicles to use a specified high occupancy vehicle (HOV) lane regardless of the number of passengers under specified circumstances; making specified requirements regarding the use of HOV lanes by plug-in electric drive vehicles applicable to qualified hybrid vehicles; extending the termination date for the exemption allowing the use of HOV lanes by plug-in electric drive vehicles; terminating specified provisions in the Act; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {640011/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/12/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-5)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2016
Legislative Date
4/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/31/2016
Legislative Date
5/28/2016
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/14/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Favorable with Amendments {640011/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/15/2016 3/12/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Third Reading Passed (133-5) 45
Senate 3/17/2016 3/17/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 46
Senate 3/18/2016 3/18/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/07/2016 4/08/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/08/2016 4/02/2016 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 71
Post Passage 5/31/2016 5/28/2016 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 734
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-314, 23-202, 25-108 )
(   2010, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM