Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Insurance - Certificates of Insurance - Fee
Sponsored by
Delegate W. Miller
Status
In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that an insurance producer is not prohibited from charging and collecting a fee, not exceeding $30, for services rendered in issuing a certain certificate of insurance or other evidence of coverage on behalf of a commercial policyholder under certain circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0880
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Commercial Insurance - Certificates of Insurance - Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Commercial Insurance - Certificates of Insurance - Fee
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   27-216 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page