Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fairness in Negotiations Act and the Public School Labor Relations Board - Sunset Repeal and Reporting Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Kaiser, A. Miller, and Walker
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date of specified provisions relating to collective bargaining for public school employees and the Public School Labor Relations Board; requiring the Board to report to the Senate Finance and the House Ways and Means Committees on specified information on or before August 1, 2018; requiring the Board to report to the Senate Finance and the House Ways and Means Committees on the Board's compliance with specified provisions in Title 10 of the State Government Article on or before December 1, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1066
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {925064/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/11/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (94-36)
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197976/1
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {197976/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8)
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-39)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/13/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Favorable with Amendments {925064/1 Report Adopted 47
House 3/14/2014 3/11/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (94-36) 48A
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Finance 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2014 3/21/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Favorable with Amendments {197976/1 50
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Laid Over (Senator Middleton) Adopted 50
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments {197976/1 Report Adopted 51
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 51
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8) 52
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 57
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Third Reading Passed (98-39) 57
House 3/26/2014 3/21/2014 Passed Enrolled 57
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 370
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM