Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charitable Organizations and Representatives - Fund-Raising Counsel - Definition
Sponsored by
Delegate Sydnor
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is engaged as an independent contractor directly by a charitable organization and who provides specified services relating to written materials prepared by a charitable organization or an employee of the charitable organization or provides specified services relating to event planning is not included in the definition of fund-raising counsel.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2016
Legislative Date
4/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/08/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
71
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/19/2016
Legislative Date
5/19/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2016 3/08/2016 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 41
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Second Reading Passed 41
House 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 43
Senate 3/14/2016 3/14/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 43
Senate 3/16/2016 3/16/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/06/2016 4/07/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 61A
Senate 4/07/2016 4/01/2016 Second Reading Passed 61A
Senate 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 67
House 4/11/2016 4/08/2016 Returned Passed 71
Post Passage 5/19/2016 5/19/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 649
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM