Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Divorce - Restoration of Former Name
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Atterbeary, Carter, Kelly, Morales, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Rosenberg, Sanchez, Sydnor, Tarlau, and Walker
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the court, on motion of a party filed within 18 months after a final decree of absolute divorce is entered, to change the name of the requesting party to either the name given the party at birth or any other former name the party wishes to use under specified circumstances; and specifying that provisions of law relating to a change of name do not apply to a change of name in connection with a decree of absolute divorce.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {572810/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Favorable with Amendments {572810/1 Report Adopted 49
House 3/19/2016 3/17/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 49
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/23/2016 3/23/2016 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM