Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Sponsored by
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee (By Request - Departmental - Information Technology)
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Codifying the establishment of the Office of Security Management within the Department of Information Technology, the position of State Chief Information Security Officer, and the Maryland Cybersecurity Coordinating Council; altering the membership of the Council; requiring each unit of the Legislative or Judicial Branch of State government that uses a certain network to certify certain compliance to the Department on or before December 1 each year; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
49
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 47A
Text - Third - State Government - Information Technology - Cybersecurity
House 3/14/2020 3/11/2020 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Rules 49
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-107,   3.5-101, 3.5-2A-01 through 3.5-2A-05, 3.5-301, 3.5-302, 3.5-303, 3.5-307, 3.5-309, 3.5-311, 3.5-404, 3.5-506, 3.5-602, 3A-101 through 3A-702   )
Last Updated: 4/13/2020 1:57 PM