Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice
Sponsored by
Baltimore City Delegation
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Baltimore City to publish notice of license application in two newspapers instead of three.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0399
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2018
Legislative Date
3/23/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Economic Matters
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/30/2018 3/23/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 57
Text - Third - Baltimore City - Board of License Commissioners - License Application Newspaper Notice
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Referred Rules 61
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-102, 12-1506 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM