Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates Carey, Adams, Arentz, Bromwell, Brooks, Kipke, Lisanti, Mautz, Miller, and Wilson
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Health to adopt certain regulations to set standards for labeling and child resistant packaging for electronic nicotine delivery systems and vaping liquid; requiring an electronic nicotine delivery systems manufacturer to ensure that electronic nicotine delivery systems and vaping liquid are packaged in accordance with the standards adopted by the Secretary and in tamper-evident packaging; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0708
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Electronic Nicotine Delivery Systems - Prohibitions and Requirements
House 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2019 3/28/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16.7-101, 16.7-301 through 16.7-303 )
(   10-107 )
(   22-301, 22-304.1, 24-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:31 PM