Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Domestic Violence - Confidentiality Program - Name of Victim
Sponsored by
Delegates Carter, Anderson, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, B. Robinson, and Rosenberg
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the scope and purpose of the Address Confidentiality Program for victims of domestic violence to include making the legal names of domestic violence victims confidential under specified circumstances; altering the contents of an application for participation in the Program; authorizing a Program participant to make a request to any State or local agency to use a substitute name designated by the Program participant as the Program participant's name; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/20/2015 2/23/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-519 through 4-523, 4-524, 4-525 through 4-529, 4-530 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM