Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Career Apprenticeship Opportunity Act of 2016
Sponsored by
Delegates McCray, Platt, Tarlau, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop, on or before December 1, 2016, specified statewide goals to be met by a specified percentage of high school graduates; requiring, on or before December 1, 2016, the State Board to develop a method to consider, under specified circumstances, a student's attainment of a specified credential as equivalent to a specified Advanced Placement examination score for a specified purpose; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0922
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-204 )
(   11-102, 11-103 )
(   10-737 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM