Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License
Sponsored by
Harford County Delegation
Status
In the House - Second Reading Passed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Class BA (bowling alley) license in Harford County; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners for Harford County to issue the license to an owner of a bowling alley entitling the holder to sell beer and wine for on- and off-premises consumption and liquor for on-premises consumption; authorizing the license holder to offer daily on-premises wine tasting; providing that a bowling alley for which the license is issued is subject to certain alcohol awareness training; providing an annual license fee of $3,000; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0381
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 38
Text - Third - Harford County – Alcoholic Beverages – Bowling Alley License
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 12:23 PM