Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Law Enforcement Officers - Entrance-Level and In-Service Training Requirements - Mental Health Issues
Sponsored by
Delegates Angel, Carter, Morales, Rosenberg, Sydnor, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Police Training Commission to require that specified entrance-level and in-service training conducted by the State and each county and municipal police training school include specified training concerning mental health issues that is developed in consultation with mental health professionals and their professional associations and is conducted by a mental health professional.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/17/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/11/2016 2/11/2016 Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/16/2016 3/17/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page