Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Inappropriate Search of Minor by Public Servant - Penalties
Sponsored by
Delegate Glass
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a specified public servant from conducting a specified inappropriate search of a minor without probable cause that the minor is concealing contraband or a weapon or without the consent of the parent or guardian of the minor; establishing penalties of imprisonment, not to exceed 1 year, or a fine, not to exceed $4,000, or both for a violation of the Act;
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1010 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Judiciary
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-602.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM