Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - General - Genetically Engineered Food - Labeling Requirements
Sponsored by
Delegates A. Kelly, Barkley, Braveboy, Carr, Cullison, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gutierrez, Hixson, Hubbard, Hucker, Lafferty, Mizeur, Morhaim, Nathan-Pulliam, Pena-Melnyk, S. Robinson, Waldstreicher, and M. Washington
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified raw foods and packaged foods that are entirely or partially produced with genetic engineering to display a specified label beginning on July 1, 2015; requiring a manufacturer to include a specified label on specified foods; requiring a supplier to include a specified label on a container used for packaging, holding, or transporting specified foods; requiring a retailer to place a specified label on a shelf or bin containing specified foods; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0778
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/10/2014 3/10/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-1001 through 21-1006 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM