Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law – Signature Verification of Absentee Ballots and Absentee Ballot Applications and Ballot Canvassing
Sponsored by
Delegate Parrott
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that certain guidelines for absentee voting provide for the verification of signatures on absentee ballot applications and absentee ballots; requiring that certain absentee ballot applications and requests require a voter to indicate the voter's preferred method to receive communication; requiring an election director to verify the signature on an absentee ballot application, a certain form, or a certain written request in a certain manner; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2024
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2021
Legislative Date
2/10/2021
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2021
Legislative Date
3/11/2021
Action
Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Election Law – Signature Verification of Absentee Ballots and Absentee Ballot Applications and Ballot Canvassing
House 2/10/2021 2/10/2021 Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/11/2021 3/11/2021 Unfavorable Report by Ways and Means
Last Updated: 4/1/2021 5:23 PM
Click to return on the top page