Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Implementation of Strategies for Preventing Sexual Exploitation of Clients by Health Professionals
Sponsored by
Delegates Smigiel, Afzali, Anderson, Bohanan, Branch, Braveboy, Burns, Cardin, Carr, Carter, Clippinger, Conaway, Gaines, Glass, Glenn, Gutierrez, Haddaway-Riccio, Holmes, Howard, Jacobs, Kaiser, K. Kelly, Kipke, Kramer, Luedtke, McConkey, McDermott, McHale, A. Miller, Minnick, Mitchell, Mizeur, Myers, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Otto, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, Ready, B. Robinson, Schulz, Simmons, Stein, Stocksdale, Swain, F. Turner, Valderrama, Waldstreicher, Walker, and A. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Implementation of Strategies for Preventing Sexual Exploitation of Clients by Health Professionals; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations on or before December 1, 2014; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/14/2014 3/15/2014 Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page