Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Moon, Barkley, Barve, Carr, Cullison, Dumais, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frick, Gilchrist, Gutierrez, Kaiser, Kelly, Korman, Kramer, Luedtke, A. Miller, Morales, Platt, Reznik, S. Robinson, Smith, and Zucker
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Supplemental Public School Construction Matching Fund Program; providing for the purpose of the Program and requiring the Department of Budget and Management to implement and administer the Program; establishing specified requirements a county must meet to be eligible for the Program; requiring the Department to provide to each county that is eligible for the Program up to $20,000,000 of State funding each fiscal year to be used to fund the cost of public school construction projects; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0228
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-3A-01 through 5-3A-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM