Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Historically Black Colleges and Universities - Evaluation
Sponsored by
Delegates Braveboy, Anderson, Barkley, Barnes, Branch, Burns, Carr, Carter, Conaway, Davis, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gaines, Gilchrist, Glass, Glenn, Gutierrez, Harper, Haynes, Holmes, Howard, Ivey, Mitchell, Mizeur, Nathan-Pulliam, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Proctor, B. Robinson, Stukes, Summers, Swain, Tarrant, F. Turner, V. Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vaughn, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Bohanan, Jones, Griffith, Stocksdale, Zucker, and Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission, in collaboration with the Department of Budget and Management, to contract with a third party for an evaluation of the needs of the Historically Black Colleges and Universities in Maryland in order to be comparable and competitive with other public universities in the State; requiring the evaluation to include specified information and recommendations; and requiring that the report be submitted on or before December 31, 2014, to the Governor and specified legislative entities.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1039
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {934863/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Appropriations
House 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/15/2014 3/15/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Favorable with Amendments {934863/1 Report Adopted 48
House 3/15/2014 3/12/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
House 3/17/2014 3/13/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 49
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Budget and Taxation 47
Senate 4/01/2014 4/01/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM