Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health – Drug Cost Commission
Sponsored by
Delegates Pena-Melnyk, Ali, Anderson, Atterbeary, B. Barnes, D. Barnes, Barron, Barve, Beidle, Branch, Brooks, Carey, Carr, Chang, Clippinger, Conaway, Cullison, Davis, Dumais, Ebersole, Fennell, Fraser-Hidalgo, Frush, Gaines, Gibson, Gilchrist, Glenn, Gutierrez, Hayes, Haynes, Healey, Hettleman, Hill, Hixson, C. Howard, Impallaria, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Kaiser, Kelly, Kramer, Lafferty, Lam, J. Lewis, R. Lewis, Lierman, Luedtke, McDonough, McIntosh, A. Miller, Moon, Morales, Morhaim, Mosby, Patterson, Platt, Proctor, Queen, Reznik, Robinson, Rosenberg, Sample-Hughes, Sanchez, Stein, Sydnor, Tarlau, Turner, Valderrama, Valentino-Smith, Vallario, Waldstreicher, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, Wilkins, Wilson, K. Young, P. Young, Pendergrass, Bromwell, Kipke, Krebs, Metzgar, Miele, Morgan, Saab, Szeliga, and West
Status
In the Senate - Favorable Report by Finance
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Drug Cost Commission to determine how to make prescription drugs more affordable for State residents, State and local government, commercial health plans and other stakeholders within the State; requiring the Commission to create an advisory council; requiring the Commission to provide public notice of each meeting, make certain materials available to the public and provide an opportunity for public comment; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations by January 1, 2019; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB1023
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Creates a Task Force or Commission
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health - Drug Cost Review Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {176889/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health – Drug Cost Commission
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
62 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Referred Rules
Proceedings
63 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Health - Drug Cost Review Commission
House 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {176889/1 Adopted 61AClick to view Recorded Media
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Health – Drug Cost Commission
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 62 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Referred Rules 63 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Hearing 4/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM
Click to return on the top page