Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Condominiums - Individual Exceptions to Limitations on Rentals
Sponsored by
Delegate M. Washington
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified person licensed to make consumer loans under specified provisions of law and a specified person who makes a secondary mortgage loan to consider a condominium unit rented under a specified exception to be owner-occupied for specified loan purposes; requiring a specified credit grantor to consider a condominium unit rented under a specified exception to be owner-occupied for specified extensions of revolving credit or extensions of closed-end credit; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2013
Legislative Date
2/08/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/05/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/07/2013 2/08/2013 First Reading Economic Matters and Environmental Matters
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
House 4/05/2013 4/05/2013 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-1002.1, 12-305.1, 12-403.2, 12-902.1 )
(   11-111.4 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM