Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
Sponsored by
Delegates B. Robinson, Anderson, Angel, Branch, Carter, Conaway, Cullison, Fennell, Glenn, Haynes, C. Howard, Jackson, Jalisi, Jones, Knotts, Lierman, A. Miller, Oaks, Patterson, Proctor, Rosenberg, Sydnor, Tarlau, Valentino-Smith, Walker, A. Washington, M. Washington, and C. Wilson
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property to be commenced by filing a complaint; requiring practice and procedure in an action to foreclose a mortgage or deed of trust on residential property to be governed by Title 2 of the Maryland Rules; prohibiting a foreclosure sale of residential property from occurring until at least 30 days after the court enters judgment in favor of the secured party; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0877
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/24/2015 2/25/2015 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
House 3/09/2015 3/09/2015 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
2/25/2015 Text - First - Fair Foreclosure Act of 2015
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-105.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM