Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages - Eligibility and Sunset Repeal
Sponsored by
Delegate Adams
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Reducing, from 160 to 100 hours, the number of training hours that a licensed physician is required to perform in a preceptor program rotation in order to qualify for a certain credit against the State income tax; repealing the termination date for certain credits against the State income tax for certain individuals who serve as preceptors in certain preceptorship programs and work in areas of the State with health care workforce shortages; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0092
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1494 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2021
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/08/2021
Legislative Date
2/08/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2021
Legislative Date
2/09/2021
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 2/08/2021 2/08/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Credits for Preceptors in Areas With Health Care Workforce Shortages - Eligibility and Sunset Repeal
House 2/09/2021 2/09/2021 Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Last Updated: 3/3/2021 8:06 AM
Click to return on the top page